Ответы и объяснения

2016-12-02T03:06:28+00:00
4*17*25 = 4*25*17 = 100*17 = 1700

5*643*2 = 5*2*643 = 10*643 = 6430

8*475*125 = 8*125*475 = 1000*475 = 475000

73*5*4 = 73*20 = 1460

2*916*50 = 2*50*916 = 100*916 = 91600

5*9*200 = 5*200*9 = 1000*9 = 9000