Ответы и объяснения

2011-05-04T18:59:07+04:00

b=48   =>  3600:b=3600:48=75, 3600*b=3600*172800;   b=24 => 3600:24=150, 3600*24=86400; b=15 => 3600:15=240, 3600*15=54000; b=50 => 3600:50=72, 3600*50=180000; b=5 => 3600:5=720, 3600*5=18000.

2011-05-04T21:29:51+04:00

3600/48=75

3600/24=150

3600/15=240

3600/50=72

3600/5=720

3600*48=172800

3600*24=86400

3600*15=54000

3600*50=180000

3600*5=18000